Kreuziger v. Milwaukee County et al
Plaintiff: Brian Kreuziger
Defendant: Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District and Milwaukee County
Case Number: 2:2019cv01747
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by S Todd Farris on behalf of Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District. Attorney(s) appearing: S. Todd Farris (Farris, S)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 2/4/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
January 20, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Milwaukee County. (Hall, Samuel)
January 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Mullin on behalf of Milwaukee County. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel K. Mullin (Mullin, Daniel)
January 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Milwaukee County. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall, Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
January 20, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District. (Warpinski, Ted)
January 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by M Andrew Skwierawski on behalf of Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District. Attorney(s) appearing: M. Andrew Skwierawski (Skwierawski, M)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted A Warpinski on behalf of Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District. Attorney(s) appearing: Ted A. Warpinski (Warpinski, Ted)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District.(Ganzer, Joseph)
December 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Brian Kreuziger (Brady, Joshua)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Brian Kreuziger (Brady, Joshua)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 2, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Brian Kreuziger (Brady, Joshua)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Brian Kreuziger by Brian Kreuziger. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3291991) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Brady, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreuziger v. Milwaukee County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kreuziger
Represented By: Joshua J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Metropolitan Sewerage District
Represented By: Katherine E Lazarski
Represented By: S Todd Farris
Represented By: Ted A Warpinski
Represented By: Joseph T Ganzer
Represented By: M Andrew Skwierawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?