Amachree v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Selepri Saingayko Amachree
Defendant: Brent Kriehn, Sheriff Dale J Schmidt, Ronald Vitiello, The County of Dodge Wisconsin, Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Unknown ICE Dept Official, Matthew Whitaker, Kirstjen Nielsen, James McHenry, United States of America and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv01772
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government defendants' answer due 2/19/2020. (cb)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/19/2019 re #45 Federal Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The court GRANTS the federal defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the federal defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 19, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Barr, Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States of America, Unknown ICE Dept Official, Ronald Vitiello (Warwick, Lisa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by William Barr, Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States of America, Unknown ICE Dept Official, Ronald Vitiello. (Warwick, Lisa)
December 17, 2019 Filing 44 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, Unknown ICE Dept Official, Ronald Vitiello and William Barr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
December 17, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, Unknown ICE Dept Official, Ronald Vitiello and William Barr. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
December 16, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (ds)
December 13, 2019 Filing 42 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dale J Schmidt, The County of Dodge Wisconsin. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Keeler, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dale J Schmidt, The County of Dodge Wisconsin. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Keeler, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #1 Consent/Refusal Form) (kah). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/16/2019) (NM). 12/13/2019: #1 Consent/Refusal Form) (kah). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/16/2019) (NM).
December 4, 2019 Filing 41 LETTER to John Gorby regarding admission and ECF registration (jcl)
December 4, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 4, 2019 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01658. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 3, 2019 Filing 39 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin the electronic record. (lma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The federal defendants' motion to dismiss for improper venue and lack of personal jurisdiction #23 is granted. Amachree's motion to amend his complaint #27 is denied. The Court hereby transfers this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. The Clerk is directed to transfer the case forthwith and terminate the case in this court. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/2/2019. (See Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details.) Mailed notice. (dm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint #27 is taken under advisement. In light of the pending motion to dismiss #23 , the Court strikes the status set for 10/9/19. The Court will set a status following a ruling. Mailed notice. (dm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 36 STATUS Report for Reassigned Case by Parties by Dale J. Schmidt, The County of Dodge, Wisconsin (Keeler, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file attached Memorandum of Law and Fact #33 is granted. Mailed notice. (dm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 34 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G Whitaker (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Selepri Saingayko Amachree for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Gorby, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Reassignment status hearing set for 10/9/19 at 10:00am in courtroom 1225. Parties are directed to review Judge Rowland's Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland, on the Court's website at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. Parties shall confer and file the reassignment joint status report at least five business days in advance of the reassignment status hearing. Mailed notice. (dm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY by Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen to Response #30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Selepri Saingayko Amachree to Defendants' motion to dismiss (Exhibits) (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 29 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9,2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Ronald A. Guzman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(rp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by John D. Gorby for presentment of motion to amend is complaints #27 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (pk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Selepri Saingayko Amachree to amend his complaints. (Exhibit) (pk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 8/14/2019. The briefing schedule as to Defendants' motion to dismiss #23 is as follows: Plaintiff's response due by 8/28/2019. Reply due by 9/11/2019. Ruling will be made electronically. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 8/7/2019. Defendants to submit a written statement to plaintiff by the end of the week as stated on the record. Status hearing set for 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. for report by plaintiff on filing his response to the motion to dismiss #23 . Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Inez Treacy for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #23 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Treacy, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Board of Immigration Appeals, Matthew G Whitaker, Ronald Vitiello, James McHenry, Unknown Ice Officers, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, Kirstjen Nielsen to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Treacy, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, Unknown Ice Officers, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G Whitaker Of Substitution of The United States as Defendant in Place of Brent Kriehn and Joseph Halase (Treacy, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 8/6/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 7/10/2019. Government's response due by 8/2/2019. Status hearing set for 8/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 7/2/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Board of Immigration Appeals, Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, Dale J. Schmidt, The County of Dodge, Wisconsin, Unknown Ice Officers, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G Whitaker (Treacy, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing held on 6/6/2019. Parties report on the status of the case. Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brent Kriehn. Brent Kriehn waiver sent on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dale J. Schmidt, The County of Dodge, Wisconsin(Hall, Samuel) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Dale J. Schmidt, The County of Dodge, Wisconsin (Keeler, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing set for 5/15/2019 is stricken and reset to 6/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing time reset to 5/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. in Courtroom 1219. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
May 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G Whitaker (pj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
May 1, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Joseph Halase, Brent Kriehn and James McHenry. (acm) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The County of Dodge, Wisconsin, Dale J. Schmidt. The County of Dodge, Wisconsin waiver sent on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Hall, Samuel) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The County of Dodge, Wisconsin, Dale J. Schmidt. Dale J. Schmidt waiver sent on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Hall, Samuel) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dale J. Schmidt, The County of Dodge, Wisconsin by William E. Keeler, III (Keeler, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dale J. Schmidt, The County of Dodge, Wisconsin by Samuel C Hall, Jr (Hall, Samuel) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 5/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from John Gordy dated 3/4/2019. (mma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Selepri Saingayko Amachree by John D. Gorby. (mma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (mma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Selepri Saingayko Amachree; Jury Demand. (Exhibits) (mma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amachree v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Kriehn
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Dale J Schmidt
Represented By: William E Keeler, III
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Dodge Wisconsin
Represented By: William E Keeler, III
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Immigration Appeals
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Halase
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown ICE Dept Official
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selepri Saingayko Amachree
Represented By: John D Gorby
Represented By: John D Gorby, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?