Alford Lofton v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: Donald Alford Lofton
Defendant: Brian Foster, Jane Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv01813
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $12.52, receipt number MK4689-081101. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/23/19 that the plaintiff is assessed $12.52 as an initial partial payment of the $350.00 fee for filing this case. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden, financial)(jad)
December 18, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Donald Alford Lofton. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cmb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Alford Lofton. (cmb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Donald Alford Lofton. (cmb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the Clerk to Donald Alford Lofton regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (bx)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury filed against Jane Doe, John Doe, Brian Foster by Donald Alford Lofton. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford Lofton v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Alford Lofton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?