United States of America v. Approximately $5000 US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $5000 US Currency
Claimant: Lynnesha Pierce Craig
Case Number: 2:2019cv01856
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Scott)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lynnesha Pierce Craig. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by United States of America to Carl Felder (22nd St. via first-class mail) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 US Marshal 285 Form returned executed - defendant property in U.S. Marshal Service custody (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by United States of America to Carl Felder (MS) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by United States of America to Carl Felder (Appleton Ave) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by United States of America to Carl Felder (22nd St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States of America to Shiama Mia Rouse (102nd St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States of America to Shiama Mia Rouse (Teutonia Ave) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States of America to Shiama Mia Rouse (84th St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America to Shiama Mia Rouse (70th St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America to Jonas Mason (28th St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued (asc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America to Jonas Mason (70th St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America to Jonas Mason (62nd St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America to Jonas Mason (48th St.) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America to Lynnesha Pierce-Craig of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from AUSA Scott J. Campbell to Clerk of Court. (Campbell, Scott)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Campbell, Scott)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $5000 US Currency by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Campbell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $5000 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $5000 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott J Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lynnesha Pierce Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?