Froedtert South Inc v Stone
Petitioner: Froedtert South Inc
Respondent: Christopher Stone
Case Number: 2:2020cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from clerk's office to plaintiff's counsel requesting the status of the case. (mlm)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Froedtert South Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Krukowski, Deborah)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Froedtert South Inc . Defendant served on 1/24/2020. (Krukowski, Deborah) Modified on 1/29/2020 (mlm).
January 27, 2020 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff Froedtert South Inc. requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Froedtert South Inc. (Krukowski, Deborah)
January 13, 2020 SECOND NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement. (mlm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO SECTION 4 OF THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT filed by Froedtert South, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Krukowski, Deborah)
January 3, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Froedtert South Inc v Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Froedtert South Inc
Represented By: Deborah A Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?