Harris v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shaniqua Harris
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00017
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (Schepard, Eric)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H Schepard on behalf of Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Schepard (Schepard, Eric)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 5/4/2020; Defendants response due 6/15/2020; Plaintiffs reply due 6/30/2020. (cc: plaintiff via USPS and all counsel) (kmm)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/21/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Shaniqua Harris)(jm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 21, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (kmm)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/17/2020 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Shaniqua Harris) (jm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Shaniqua Harris. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Shaniqua Harris. (asc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Shaniqua Harris ;Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaniqua Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Eric H Schepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?