Hamilton v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Zakiya Hamilton
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00020
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/31/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Zakiya Hamilton. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kerbawy, Christopher)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 3/13/2020 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 4/22/2020; defendant's response due 6/1/2020; plaintiff's reply due 6/16/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (kmm)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/8/2020 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
January 7, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Zakiya Hamilton. (Kerbawy, Christopher)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Zakiya Hamilton. (Kerbawy, Christopher)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Zakiya Hamilton (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kerbawy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zakiya Hamilton
Represented By: Christopher A W Kerbawy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?