Griffin v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sandra Faye Griffin
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00062
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/24/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Sandra Griffin)(cb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 3/23/2020 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 5/4/2020; defendant's response due 6/15/2020; plaintiff's reply due 6/30/2020. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Sandra Griffin) (cb)
January 21, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (kmm)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/17/2020 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Sandra Griffin) (cb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sandra Faye Griffin. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kmm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Sandra Faye Griffin. (kmm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Sandra Faye Griffin.Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge Joseph. (kmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Faye Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?