Cavanaugh v. Tannan et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Cavanaugh
Defendant: MD Dilip K Tannan, Md Thomas W Grossman and RN Sandra McArdle
Case Number: 2:2020cv00108
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marcus Cavanaugh.(asc)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER re #1 Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/2/2020. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee is GRANTED; agency having custody of Plaintiff to COLLECT the balance of the filing fee in accordance with this Order. By 3/23/2020, Plaintiff to FILE an amended complaint or this action will be dismissed. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Marcus Cavanaugh and Warden at Kettle Moraine Correctional Institution) (jm)
February 14, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $26.65, receipt number MK4689-4689081528. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Marcus Cavanaugh. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/28/2020 ORDERING that on or before 2/18/2020, Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $26.65 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Marcus Cavanaugh and Warden at Kettle Moraine Correctional Institution)(jm)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marcus Cavanaugh. (ds)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Marcus Cavanaugh. (ds)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Marcus Cavanaugh. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavanaugh v. Tannan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Dilip K Tannan
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Md Thomas W Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Sandra McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?