Koziczkowski v. Forefront Dermatology SC et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Rachel Ade Koziczkowski and Dr Rachel Ade Koziczkowski
Defendant: Dr. Betsy Wernli, Forefront Dermatology SC and Dr Betsy Wernli
Case Number: 2:2020cv00115
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 4:19-cv-04067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's Reply in Support of their Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A) by Forefront Dermatology, S.C. (ED, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on January 24, 2020. The Court GRANTS Defendants' #4 Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and #8 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the ( #8 at 5-8) Reply. The Clerk is also directed to TRANSFER this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and close the case.(GS, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kelsey Ann Ward Marquard on behalf of Rachel Ade Koziczkowski (Marquard, Kelsey) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sarah E Flotte on behalf of All Defendants (Flotte, Sarah) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Forefront Dermatology, S.C.. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Paul, Brian) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on July 2, 2019. Defendants filed a #7 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint. Local Rule 7.1(B)(3) provides that "[n]o reply to the response is permitted without leave of Court" and Rule 7.1(F) provides that "[i]f filing a document requires leave of the court, the filing party must attach the proposed document as an exhibit to a motion to file." Defendants did not attach their proposed reply to their #7 motion and it is therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants may file a renewed motion for leave to file a reply, with their proposed reply attached as an exhibit, within ten days. (KML, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Betsy Wernli. Responses due by 5/24/2019 (Paul, Brian) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Plaintiff Rachel Ade Koziczkowski. (Wright, Allison) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
May 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 5/8/2019. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on May 1, 2019. Plaintiff filed a #5 motion for an extension of time to respond to the #4 motion to transfer. The response is currently due May 1, 2019. Plaintiff seeks an additional week and indicates that Defendants do not oppose the request. The #5 motion is GRANTED and the response to the #4 motion to transfer is now due May 8, 2019. (KML, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Transfer by Plaintiff Rachel Ade Koziczkowski. Responses due by 5/15/2019 (Wright, Allison) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Defendants Forefront Dermatology, S.C., Betsy Wernli. Responses due by 5/1/2019 (Paul, Brian) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian P Paul on behalf of All Defendants (Paul, Brian) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued and returned to counsel to effect service. (ED, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forefront Dermatology, S.C. and Dr. Betsy Wernli (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3069930.), filed by Rachel Ade Koziczkowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for Defendant Forefront, #4 Summons for Defendant Wernli)(Wright, Allison) Modified on 3/27/2019 to reflect against defendants (ED, ilcd). [Transferred from ilcd on 1/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koziczkowski v. Forefront Dermatology SC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Rachel Ade Koziczkowski
Represented By: Allison Kay Wright
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Ward Marquard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Rachel Ade Koziczkowski
Represented By: Allison Kay Wright
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Ward Marquard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Betsy Wernli
Represented By: Sarah E Flotte
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forefront Dermatology SC
Represented By: Sarah E Flotte
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Represented By: Michael K Chropowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A Odian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Betsy Wernli
Represented By: Sarah E Flotte
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Represented By: Michael K Chropowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A Odian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?