Lutz v. Beechwood Distributors Inc
Plaintiff: John Lutz
Defendant: Beechwood Distributors Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00132
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by John Lutz. (Olson, Alan)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/25/20. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on April 8, 2020 at 1:45 p.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
February 24, 2020 Due to non-consent this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (ds)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Beechwood Distributors Inc.(Walcheske, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Beechwood Distributors Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Walcheske, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Beechwood Distributors Inc. (Walcheske, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Walcheske on behalf of Beechwood Distributors Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: James A. Walcheske (Walcheske, James)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by John Lutz. (Olson, Alan)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE to Plaintiff - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (ds)
January 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to Beechwood Distributors Inc. (ds)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by John Lutz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olson, Alan)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by John Lutz (Olson, Alan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Beechwood Distributors Inc by John Lutz. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3343840) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutz v. Beechwood Distributors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lutz
Represented By: Alan C Olson
Represented By: Brianna M Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beechwood Distributors Inc
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?