National Labor Relations Board v. Sunbelt Rentals Inc
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Sunbelt Rentals Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00181
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF filed by National Labor Relations Board Petitioner's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Section 10(j) Injunction. (Wiese, Tyler)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc re #1 Petition - Civil Case Filing, Respondent's Memorandum of Law in Opposition. (Hill, Patricia)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/3/2020 GRANTING #13 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply Brief. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Memorandum by National Labor Relations Board. (Wiese, Tyler)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 APPENDIX by National Labor Relations Board Submitting Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A-Transcript of Administrative Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Attachment B-Petitioner Exhibits (1 of 2), #3 Exhibit Attachment C-Petitioner Exhibits (2 of 2), #4 Exhibit Attachment D-Respondent Exhibits (1 of 4), #5 Exhibit Attachment E-Respondent Exhibits (2 of 4), #6 Exhibit Attachment F-Respondent Exhibits (3 of 4), #7 Exhibit Attachment G-Respondent Exhibits (4 of 4), #8 Exhibit Attachment H-Joint Exhibit, #9 Exhibit Attachment I-Supplemental Affidavit)(Wiese, Tyler)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/24/2020 GRANTING #2 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Try Petition Based on Administrative Record and Supplemental Affidavits. Respondent shall respond to the Petition by 3/5/2020; Petitioner may reply by 3/12/2020. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
February 19, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
February 19, 2020 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 3 days (mlm) Modified on 2/19/2020 (mlm). Modified on 2/19/2020 (ds).
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by National Labor Relations Board. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Medved, Renee)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hill, Patricia)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. (Hill, Patricia)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J Wiese on behalf of National Labor Relations Board. Attorney(s) appearing: Tyler J. Wiese (Wiese, Tyler)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Jones on behalf of Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ian M. Jones (Jones, Ian)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Yash Dave on behalf of Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Yash B. Dave (Dave, Yash)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Hill on behalf of Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Patricia J. Hill (Hill, Patricia)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board of Petition, Proposed Orders, and Related Motion (Medved, Renee)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record and Supplemental Affidavits by National Labor Relations Board. (Medved, Renee)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Text of Proposed Order, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Medved, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Sunbelt Rentals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sunbelt Rentals Inc
Represented By: Patricia Hill
Represented By: Yash Dave
Represented By: Ian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Renee M Medved
Represented By: Tyler J Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?