ExeGi Pharma LLC v. Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC
Plaintiff: ExeGi Pharma LLC
Defendant: Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00192
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE Statement by Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC. (LaFlamme, Eugene)
April 6, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC.(LaFlamme, Eugene)
April 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob E Kempowski on behalf of Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacob E. Kempowski and Eugene M. LaFlamme (Kempowski, Jacob)
April 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene M LaFlamme on behalf of Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Eugene M. LaFlamme and Jacob E. Kempowski (LaFlamme, Eugene)
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 3/20/2020. (Court Reporter Thomas Malkiewicz)(cl)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 Preliminary PRETRIAL REPORT by ExeGi Pharma LLC. (Reynolds, Thomas)
March 17, 2020 UPDATED Notice of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge J P Stadtmueller will be BY TELEPHONE ONLY. All parties must notify the Court, in advance, of the direct number at which they can be reached. All other aspects of #11 Notice of Hearing remain. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James J Schaller on behalf of ExeGi Pharma LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: James J. Schaller (Schaller, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabina S Schiller on behalf of ExeGi Pharma LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Sabina S. Schiller (Schiller, Sabina)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Gavenman on behalf of ExeGi Pharma LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey S. Gavenman (Gavenman, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy W Schulman on behalf of ExeGi Pharma LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeremy W. Schulman (Schulman, Jeremy)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 3/17/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
February 26, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (lz)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by ExeGi Pharma LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Reynolds, Thomas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Miotke, Joseph)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 2/25/2020. The defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No #7 ) is granted. Brookfield Pharmaceuticals, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than April 6, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #5 & #6 Notice of Appearances filed by Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC; Documents should be filed by the attorney with the electronic (s/) signature. These documents do not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Unopposed Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading)(Miotke, Joseph)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Miotke on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Hills (Miotke, Joseph)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Miotke on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Olivia M. Kelley (Miotke, Joseph)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Miotke on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph T. Miotke (Miotke, Joseph)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ExeGi Pharma LLC. Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC served on 2/13/2020. (Reynolds, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC. (lz)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by ExeGi Pharma LLC. (Reynolds, Thomas)
February 7, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC by ExeGi Pharma LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3355740) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reynolds, Thomas) Modified on 2/7/2020 (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ExeGi Pharma LLC v. Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Hills
Represented By: Olivia M Kelley
Represented By: Jacob E Kempowski
Represented By: Joseph T Miotke
Represented By: Eugene M LaFlamme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ExeGi Pharma LLC
Represented By: Thomas S Reynolds, II
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Represented By: Jeffrey Gavenman
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Represented By: James J Schaller
Represented By: Sabina S Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?