Clausen v. Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30 et al.
Plaintiff: Gene Clausen
Defendant: Johnson Insurance Services LLC, Hydraulic Fittings Incorporated, Sheldon Rosen, Benny Castro, Gary Fairhead, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Midwest Pension Plan, Anthony Iori, Lynette Allan, Norman Soep, Health Care Service Corporation, Bruce Saltzberg, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, My Benefits Group Inc, Mark Spano and Kathy Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2020cv00199
Filed: February 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/7/20 granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE by Johnson Insurance Services LLC Certificate of Interest (Hodan, Patrick)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Hodan on behalf of Johnson Insurance Services LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick Hodan, Malinda Eskra and Monica Mark (Hodan, Patrick)
April 6, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Johnson Insurance Services LLC.(Hodan, Patrick)
April 6, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hydraulic Fittings Incorporated - Waiver sent on 2/12/2020. (Crone, Thomas)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynette Allan, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Benny Castro, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, Gary Fairhead, Health Care Service Corporation, Anthony Iori, Midwest Pension Plan, Kathy Rodriguez, Sheldon Rosen, Bruce Saltzberg, Norman Soep, Mark Spano of Defendants' First Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading (Blumthal, William)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED Order Extending Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Lynette Allan, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Benny Castro, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, Gary Fairhead, Health Care Service Corporation, Anthony Iori, Midwest Pension Plan, Kathy Rodriguez, Sheldon Rosen, Bruce Saltzberg, Norman Soep, Mark Spano. (Blumthal, William)
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Lynette Allan, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Benny Castro, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, Gary Fairhead, Health Care Service Corporation, Anthony Iori, Midwest Pension Plan, Kathy Rodriguez, Sheldon Rosen, Bruce Saltzberg, Norman Soep, Mark Spano. (Blumthal, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, Gary)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 DOCKETED IN ERROR SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. My Benefits Group Inc served on 3/19/2020. (Thompson, Gary) Modified on 3/20/2020 (jcl).
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Krol on behalf of Health Care Service Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey A. Krol (Krol, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blumthal, William)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Health Care Service Corporation. (Blumthal, William)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Blumthal, Jr on behalf of Health Care Service Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: William M. Blumthal, Jr. (Blumthal, William)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johnson Insurance Services LLC - Waiver sent on 3/10/2020. (Thompson, Gary)
March 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to My Benefits Group Inc. (asc)
March 5, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lynette Allan, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Benny Castro, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, Gary Fairhead, Anthony Iori, Midwest Pension Plan, Kathy Rodriguez, Sheldon Rosen, Bruce Saltzberg, Norman Soep, Mark Spano. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blumthal, William)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lynette Allan, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Benny Castro, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, Gary Fairhead, Anthony Iori, Midwest Pension Plan, Kathy Rodriguez, Sheldon Rosen, Bruce Saltzberg, Norman Soep, Mark Spano. (Blumthal, William)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Request for Issuance of Summons for Defendant My Benefits Group Inc (ECF No. #7 ) was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (mlm)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs to Defendant MY BENEFITS GROUP, INC. (Thompson, Gary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Complaint on 2/12/20 by CHEMICAL & PRODUCTION WORKERS UNION, LOCAL 30; MIDWEST PENSION PLAN; CENTRAL STATES JOINT BOARD HEALTH & WELFARE FUND of the Chemical & Production Workers Union, Local 30; BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF WELFARE FUND; LYNETTE ALLAN, Plan Manager; NORMAN SOEP, Trustee; GARY FAIRHEAD, Trustee; SHELDON ROSEN, Trustee; MARK SPANO, Trustee and Union Local 30 President; BENNY CASTRO, Trustee; ANTHONY IORI, Trustee; KATHY RODRIGUEZ, Trustee BRUCE SALTZBERG, Trustee (Thompson, Gary)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Krol on behalf of Lynette Allan, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Benny Castro, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, Gary Fairhead, Anthony Iori, Midwest Pension Plan, Kathy Rodriguez, Sheldon Rosen, Bruce Saltzberg, Norman Soep, Mark Spano. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey A. Krol (Krol, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Blumthal, Jr on behalf of Lynette Allan, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Benny Castro, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30, Gary Fairhead, Anthony Iori, Midwest Pension Plan, Kathy Rodriguez, Sheldon Rosen, Bruce Saltzberg, Norman Soep, Mark Spano. Attorney(s) appearing: William M. Blumthal, Jr. (Blumthal, William)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gene Clausen. (Thompson, Gary)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Thompson, Gary)
February 8, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cmb)
February 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Gene Clausen v. Chemical & Production Works Union, Local 30, Midwest Pension Plan, Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund, Lynette Allan, Norman Soep, Gary Fairhead, Sheldon Rosen, Mark Spano, Benny Castro, Anthony iori, Kathy Rodriguez, Bruce Saltzberg, My Benefits Group, Inc., Johnson Insurance Services, LLC, Health Care Service Corporation and Hydraulic Fittings, Incorporated against Johnson Insurance Services LLC by Johnson Insurance Services LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3356479)(Thompson, Gary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clausen v. Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30 et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Clausen
Represented By: Gary W Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Insurance Services LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Hodan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydraulic Fittings Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Rosen
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Castro
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Fairhead
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central States Joint Board Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Pension Plan
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Iori
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette Allan
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Soep
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Saltzberg
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemical & Production Workers Union Local 30
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Benefits Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Spano
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krol
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?