Nieuwenhuis et al v. Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse et al
Plaintiff: Bob Nieuwenhuis and Kelly Nieuwenhuis
Defendant: JKL Insurance Companies, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, GHI Companies, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, ABC Insurance Companies, Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse and DEF Insurance Companies
Case Number: 2:2020cv00283
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/1/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC. (Andrews, Eric)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Appearance of Counsel Groth by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richard, Jason) Modified on 3/31/2020 (jcl).
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andrews, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/9/2020. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on April 23, 2020 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim and Cross-Claim of United Healthcare Insurance Company filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse. (Andrews, Eric)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse. (Andrews, Eric)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to Ryan J. Truesdale regarding Admission and ECF registration (sent via USPS) (jcl)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Defendants' Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC.(Andrews, Eric)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC. (Andrews, Eric)
February 20, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020-CV-53 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3369664) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Returns of Service to Defendants, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Recorded Articles of Merger and Recorded Certificate of Withdrawal or Cancellation, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieuwenhuis et al v. Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadhouse of New Berlin, LLC d/b/a Texas Roadhouse
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Nieuwenhuis
Represented By: Jonathan P Groth
Represented By: Ryan J Truesdale
Represented By: Jason S Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Nieuwenhuis
Represented By: Jonathan P Groth
Represented By: Ryan J Truesdale
Represented By: Jason S Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?