Henderson v. Milwaukee Math and Science Academy et al
Plaintiff: Torva Henderson
Defendant: Anthony T. King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy and Anthony T King
Case Number: 2:2020cv00315
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket #4 ) is GRANTED. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Henderson's amended complaint (Docket # 15 ) is stricken. Henderson must either obtain written consent from the defendants to amend her complaint or seek leave of the court to do so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 STRICKEN; PURSUANT TO #14 ORDER AMENDED COMPLAINT 1 with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Torva Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Criminal History, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Investigation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Investigation)(Swanigan, Verona) Modified on 4/17/2020 (asc).
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL Authority re #4 Motion to Dismiss by Anthony T King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy . (Stadler, Ronald) Modified on 4/16/2020 (asc).
March 24, 2020 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Anthony T King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stadler, Ronald)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Swanigan, Verona)
March 13, 2020 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to ALL PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than 3/27/2020; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Anthony T King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Stadler, Ronald)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 A amended ERD complaint, #2 B Criminal History, #3 C Improper Investigation Findings 1, #4 D Improper Investigation Findings 2)(Swanigan, Verona)
March 4, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Declaration; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (ds)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Anthony T King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy. (Stadler, Ronald)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Huseyin Alper Akyurek (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of EEOC Charge No. 443-2018-01666, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue Letter issued to Plaintiff by EEOC, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of charge filed by Plaintiff against MMSA - ERD Case No. 20200129; EEOC No. 26G2202000403C)(Stadler, Ronald) Modified on 3/12/2020 (ds).
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support filed by Anthony T King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Stadler, Ronald)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Anthony T King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy. (Stadler, Ronald)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E Sacks on behalf of Anthony T. King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan Sacks (Sacks, Jonathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony T. King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy (Stadler, Ronald)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthony T. King, Milwaukee Math and Science Academy from Circuit Court - Milwaukee County, Case Number: 20-CV-755 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3375206)(Stadler, Ronald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Milwaukee Math and Science Academy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony T. King
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Math and Science Academy
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony T King
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torva Henderson
Represented By: Verona E Swanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?