Franz v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lori Jean Franz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00488
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/13/2020. (blr)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 4/6/2020. (blr)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/7/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Lori Franz)(cb)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of SERVICE filed by Lori Jean Franz.(blr)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lori Jean Franz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 5/31/2020 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 7/10/2020; defendant's response due 8/19/2020; plaintiff's reply due 9/3/2020. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Lori Franz) (cb)
March 30, 2020 Transmit #1 Complaint, per chambers, via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (asc)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Lori Jean Franz ;Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin (Filing Fee PAID $400 #MK4689-082059) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franz v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Jean Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?