Harris v. Aliera Healthcare Inc
Plaintiff: Margaret Harris
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare Inc. and Aliera Healthcare Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00492
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Aliera Healthcare Inc re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (Watson, Kristen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Margaret Harris (Nudo, Anthony)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Margaret Harris re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (Nudo, Anthony)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE : Summons returned executed on 3/6/2020 as to defendant by Margaret Harris (Nudo, Anthony) Modified on 4/7/2020 (asc).
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Aliera Healthcare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Declaration)(Watson, Kristen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Aliera Healthcare Inc. (Watson, Kristen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Nudo on behalf of Margaret Harris. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony Nudo (Nudo, Anthony)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aliera Healthcare Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020-CV-001602 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3404721) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Watson, Kristen)
March 26, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Aliera Healthcare Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Kristen P Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Kristen P Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Harris
Represented By: Anthony Nudo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?