Redig v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dale Redig
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00500
Filed: March 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 7/31/2020; Defendants response due 9/8/2020; Plaintiffs reply due 9/23/2020. (cc: all counsel) (lh)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 4/16/2020. (tlf)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
April 3, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (tlf)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, filed by Dale Redig, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/02/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dale Redig. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Traver, David)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
March 28, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Dale Redig. (Traver, David)
March 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dale Redig. (Traver, David)
March 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul by Dale Redig. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter of appeal to the Appeals Council)(Traver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redig v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Redig
Represented By: David F Traver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?