Windom v. Phoenix Precision Products LLC
Plaintiff: Fredrick Windom
Defendant: Phoenix Precision Products LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00566
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Case Terminated (vkb)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fredrick Windom. (Lueder, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fredrick Windom. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lueder, Michael)
April 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to Phoenix Precision Products LLC. (vkb)
April 7, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Phoenix Precision Products LLC by Fredrick Windom. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3414854) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lueder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windom v. Phoenix Precision Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Windom
Represented By: Michael C Lueder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Precision Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?