Skony et al v. Depuy Synthes Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mary L Skony, Alex M Azar, II and Plumbers Local 75 Health Fund
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Synthes USA Products, LLC, Depuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products LLC, Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Synthes Inc and Depuy Synthes Sales Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00690
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Case Terminated pursuant to #24 Order. (amb)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/25/2020 APPROVING #23 joint stipulation for dismissal. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 24, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Mary L Skony. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Proposed Order for Dismissal)(Robinson, Edward) Modified on 11/25/2020 (amb).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/2/2020 re #19 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation and ORDERS that the scheduling order entered June 19, 2020, dkt. no. 14, is AMENDED as follows: the plaintiff shall disclose the identities and reports of expert witnesses by the end of the day on December 15, 2020; the defendants shall disclose the identities and reports of expert witnesses by the end of the day on February 14, 2021; the parties shall complete discovery by the end of the day on March 31, 2021; dispositive motions shall be filed by the end of the day on May 1, 2021, the response and reply deadlines mandated by Civil L.R. 56 shall apply, the parties shall file a joint status report by May 1, 2021 if they choose not to file a dispositive motion; Daubert motions shall be filed by the end of the day on May 1, 2021, responses are due by the end of the day on May 19, 2021. The court reiterates that, as noted in the original scheduling order, with regard to settlement/mediation, Magistrate Judges in the Eastern District of Wisconsin are conducting mediations via videoconference. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #20 Proposed Document filed by Mary L Skony ; Proposed Orders should be e-filed as an attachment to the stipulation or motion and NOT e-filed as a separate document. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word or WordPerfect format. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
October 1, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER from Attorney Robinson (Corrected) . (Robinson, Edward)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED Amended Scheduling Order filed by Mary L Skony. (Robinson, Edward)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by Mary L Skony. (Robinson, Edward)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER from Edward Robinson . (Robinson, Edward)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/28/2020 GRANTING #16 stipulated motion for protective order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Wittenberg, Christa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth L Moskow on behalf of Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Synthes USA Products LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Kenneth L. Moskow (Moskow, Kenneth)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/19/2020: Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 6/30/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2020; Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 12/1/2020; Discovery due by 1/15/2021; Daubert Motions due by 2/15/2021, responses due by 3/5/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2021, response and reply deadlines mandated by Civil LR 56 apply, parties to file joint status report if they choose not to file dispositive motion. Any party filing proposed findings of fact to email Word version of proposed findings to PepperPO@wied.uscourts.gov. The court directs the parties' attention to the portion of the order addressing settlement/mediation and reiterates that Magistrate Judges in the Eastern District of Wisconsin are conducting mediations via videoconference. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Edward)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Donn C Alexander on behalf of Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Attorney(s) appearing: Donn C. Alexander (Alexander, Donn)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/19/2020. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 6/18/2020. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Killoran, Grant)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Killoran, Grant)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mary L Skony. (Robinson, Edward)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mary L Skony. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Robinson, Edward)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alex M Azar, II. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of Alex M Azar, II. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward E Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Edward E. Robinson (Robinson, Edward)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant C Killoran on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Grant C. Killoran (Killoran, Grant)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Wittenberg, Christa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Depuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC from Waukesha County Courthouse, Case Number: 2020CV000525 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3443177) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wittenberg, Christa) Modified on 5/6/2020 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skony et al v. Depuy Synthes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L Skony
Represented By: Edward E Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers Local 75 Health Fund
Represented By: Michael D Riegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Represented By: Donn C Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth L Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes USA Products, LLC
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes, Inc.
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes USA Products LLC
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Represented By: Kenneth L Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Represented By: Donn C Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth L Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Inc
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Represented By: Donn C Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth L Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales Inc
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Represented By: Donn C Alexander
Represented By: Kenneth L Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?