American Strategic Insurance Company et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Company and Lance Mortensen
Defendant: General Motors Company and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00888
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Lance Mortensen, American Strategic Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company.(asc)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/31/2020. #9 Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Party is DENIED. #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED; the amended complaint (Docket #10-1) shall be the OPERATIVE complaint. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Policastro, Matthew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by All Plaintiffs. (Policastro, Matthew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Alias Summons & Complaint on 06-26-2020 by Adam Golden (Policastro, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Summons Reissued as to General Motors Company. (asc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Policastro, Matthew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint on 06-16-2020 by General Motors Company c/o The Corporation Company as agent for service (Policastro, Matthew)
June 12, 2020 Summons Issued as to General Motors Company. (asc)
June 12, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Policastro, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Progressive Universal Insurance Company. (Policastro, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by American Strategic Insurance Company. (Policastro, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Policastro, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by American Strategic Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3476648)(Policastro, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Company et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew F Policastro
Represented By: Michelle D Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew F Policastro
Represented By: Michelle D Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Mortensen
Represented By: Matthew F Policastro
Represented By: Michelle D Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?