Nohara v. Prevea Clinic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alison J Nohara
Defendant: Prevea Clinic, Inc., The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic, Inc., Prevea Clinic Inc and The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01079
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D Netter on behalf of Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian D. Netter (Netter, Brian)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan (Joint Rule 26(f) Conference Report) by Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. (Ross, Nancy)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving #12 Stipulation filed by Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before October 2, 2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. (Ross, Nancy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Nancy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2020 09:30 AM By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 18, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge William C Griesbach. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to the case. (jcl)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/17/20 GRANTING #9 Stipulation to Transfer Case to the Green Bay Division. (cc: all counsel)(jad) Modified on 8/17/2020 (jad).
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the Green Bay Division by Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Nancy)
August 8, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc - Waiver sent on 7/17/2020. (Luzi, Scott)
August 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Prevea Clinic Inc - Waiver sent on 7/17/2020. (Luzi, Scott)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Nowak on behalf of Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Richard E. Nowak (Nowak, Richard)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy G Ross on behalf of Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Nancy G. Ross (Ross, Nancy)
July 17, 2020 Summonses Issued as to Prevea Clinic Inc, The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc. (lz)
July 17, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (lz)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alison J Nohara. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Secunda, Paul)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M Secunda on behalf of Alison J Nohara. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul M Secunda, James A Walcheske, Scott S Luzi (Secunda, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Alison J Nohara. (Secunda, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prevea Clinic, Inc., The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic, Inc. by Alison J Nohara. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3511404) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Prevea Clinic, Inc., #3 Summons The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic, Inc.)(Secunda, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nohara v. Prevea Clinic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison J Nohara
Represented By: Paul M Secunda
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevea Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevea Clinic Inc
Represented By: Richard Nowak
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Nancy G Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors of Prevea Clinic Inc
Represented By: Richard Nowak
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Nancy G Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?