Rouse v. SDM Living Trust et al
Plaintiff: Ora Rouse
Defendant: Wesley Anderson, Citywide Rentals, MPI Property Management and SDM Living Trust
Case Number: 2:2020cv01083
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/20. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(jad)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/21/20 that Magistrate Judge Joseph's Report and Recommendation #5 is ACCEPTED. For the reasons stated in the report and recommendation, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (jad)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Ora Rouse re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint - Pro Se filed by Ora Rouse (jcl)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Ora Rouse re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (asc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff requesting clarification of deadlines (Attachments: #1 Letter)(jcl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ora Rouse. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
July 21, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Rouse's complaint be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(asc)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that Rouse's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (Docket #2 ) is GRANTED. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (asc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ora Rouse. (ds)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ora Rouse. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. SDM Living Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citywide Rentals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPI Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDM Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?