Nowak v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nowak
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01088
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/21/2020. (amb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 8/24/2020. (amb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Andrew Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 11/30/2020; Defendants response due 01/11/2021; Plaintiffs reply due 01/26/2021. (cc: all counsel) (kmm)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/18/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jennifer Nowak. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jennifer Nowak. (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jennifer Nowak. (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Jennifer Nowak (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drexler-Dreis, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowak v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nowak
Represented By: Leah A Drexler-Dreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?