Weiss v. Dehann
Petitioner: Mark A Weiss
Respondent: Suesan Dehann
Case Number: 2:2020cv01094
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/14/20 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, petitioner) (jad)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from Mark Weiss re case status (re-mail dkt #6 to plaintiff). (bx)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Sent to Mark A Weiss Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order, (bx)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Suesan Dehann (Collins, Winn)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/3/20 that, within thirty days of service of this order, the respondent shall show cause why the petition for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve a copy of this order along with the petition and all exhibits on the respondent. (cc: all counsel, petitioner)(jad)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mark A Weiss. (bx)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mark A Weiss. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (bx)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Mark A Weiss re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement and or filing fee be filed within 21 days. (bx)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mark A Weiss. (bx)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark A Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibits)(bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss v. Dehann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark A Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Suesan Dehann
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?