Direct Supply Inc v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Direct Supply Inc
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01095
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Howlette, Jordan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc (White, Barry)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc Court's magistrate judge consent form (White, Barry)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc updated Summons on Hon. Charles Rettig (White, Barry)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc Consent/Refusal to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge (White, Barry)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Direct Supply Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (White, Barry)
July 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to The Honorable Charles P. Rettig. (amb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Direct Supply Inc (White, Barry)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Direct Supply Inc. United States of America served on 7/20/2020. (White, Barry)
July 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (amb)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by Direct Supply Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3513285) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Rule 7.1 Diclosure)(White, Barry) Modified on 7/20/2020 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Direct Supply Inc v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jordan David Howlette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Supply Inc
Represented By: Barry R White
Represented By: Robert E Dallman
Represented By: Matthew J Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?