Centennial Partners LLC v. Wentwood Capital Advisors LP et al
Plaintiff: Centennial Partners, LLC and Centennial Partners LLC
Defendant: Wentwood Capital Advisors, LP, Wentwood ORC Advisors, LLC, Wentwood Capital Advisors LP and Wentwood ORC Advisors LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01169
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 This case has been reassigned to newly appointed judge, Hon. Brett Ludwig. (kmm)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #9 MOTION to Stay Discovery . (Schreiber, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (regarding Amended Complaint) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Special Verdict), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Complaint), #3 Appendix of Unpublished Opinions (Part 1 of 2), #4 Appendix of Unpublished Opinions (Part 2 of 2))(Schreiber, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (regarding Amended Complaint) by All Defendants. (Schreiber, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 UNPUBLISHED Decision filed by Centennial Partners LLC (Trigg, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Centennial Partners LLC re #9 MOTION to Stay Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket Report, # 18-CV-6109)(Trigg, Stephen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 UNPUBLISHED Decision (Response to Motion to Dismiss) filed by Centennial Partners LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Trigg, Stephen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Centennial Partners LLC re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Trigg, Stephen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 UNPUBLISHED Decision (Table of Unpublished Authorities) filed by Centennial Partners LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weber, Ralph)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Centennial Partners LLC filed by Centennial Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Weber, Ralph)
August 20, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Discovery on 07/01/2020 by Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proof of Service)(Trigg, Stephen)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Centennial Partners LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Trigg, Stephen)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Centennial Partners LLC. (Trigg, Stephen)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #9 MOTION to Stay Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Interrogatories and document requests served with current complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Document requests to ORC Tax Credit Fund 10 LLC in prior case), #3 Exhibit C (Document requests to SCDC, LLC in prior case))(Schreiber, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Discovery by All Defendants. (Schreiber, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Special Verdict), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Complaint), #3 Appendix of Unpublished Opinions (Part 1 of 2), #4 Appendix of Unpublished Opinions (Part 2 of 2))(Schreiber, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Schreiber, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Beth Bacon on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura B. Bacon (Bacon, Laura)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wentwood ORC Advisors LLC. (Schreiber, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wentwood Capital Advisors LP. (Schreiber, John)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT by All Defendants CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Schreiber, John)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by All Defendants EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Part 1 of 5), #2 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Part 2 of 5), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Part 3 of 5), #4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Part 4 of 5), #5 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Part 5 of 5))(Schreiber, John)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wentwood ORC Advisors, LLC, Wentwood Capital Advisors, LP from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020CV003661 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3525650) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (J. Wimmer Depo. Excerpt), #2 Exhibit B (M. Wimmer Depo. Excerpt), #3 Exhibit D (Milwaukee County Court Docket), #4 Exhibit E (Notice of Notice of Removal))(Schreiber, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centennial Partners LLC v. Wentwood Capital Advisors LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wentwood Capital Advisors, LP
Represented By: John R Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wentwood ORC Advisors, LLC
Represented By: John R Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wentwood Capital Advisors LP
Represented By: John R Schreiber
Represented By: Louis E Dolan
Represented By: Laura Beth Bacon
Represented By: Brian P Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wentwood ORC Advisors LLC
Represented By: John R Schreiber
Represented By: Louis E Dolan
Represented By: Laura Beth Bacon
Represented By: Brian P Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centennial Partners, LLC
Represented By: Ralph A Weber
Represented By: Stephen T Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centennial Partners LLC
Represented By: Ralph A Weber
Represented By: Stephen T Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?