The Scan Group Inc v. Jensen et al
Plaintiff: The Scan Group, Inc. and The Scan Group Inc
Defendant: Jacob Jensen, Melissa Jensen, CLIF Bar & Co., MARS, Inc., MARS Inc and CLIF Bar & Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv01187
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLIF Bar & Co - Waiver sent on 8/9/2020. (Potteiger, David)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARS Inc - Waiver sent on 8/9/2020. (Potteiger, David)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacob Jensen - Waiver sent on 8/3/2020. (Potteiger, David)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melissa Jensen - Waiver sent on 8/3/2020. (Potteiger, David)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacob Jensen - Waiver sent on 8/12/2020. (Potteiger, David) Modified on 9/22/2020 (amb).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by The Scan Group Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Potteiger, David)
August 4, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been added - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. Punctuation and addresses removed from party names - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
August 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)
August 3, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by The Scan Group, Inc.. (Potteiger, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Potteiger on behalf of The Scan Group, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske, and David M. Potteiger (Potteiger, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against CLIF Bar & Co., Jacob Jensen, Melissa Jensen, MARS, Inc. by The Scan Group, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number CWIEDC-3528553) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jacob Jensen Summons, #3 Summons Melissa Jensen Summons, #4 Summons MARS, Inc. Summons, #5 Summons CLIF Bar & Co. Summons)(Potteiger, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Scan Group Inc v. Jensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scan Group, Inc.
Represented By: David M Potteiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scan Group Inc
Represented By: David M Potteiger
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIF Bar & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIF Bar & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?