Hribar Transport LLC v. Slegers
Plaintiff: Hribar Transport LLC
Defendant: Michael Slegers
Case Number: 2:2020cv01255
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Pamela M. Schmidt Supporting Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, for Transfer of Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stanaszak, Steven)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Michael Slegers re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana . (Attachments: #1 Healthfuse v. CDH-Delnor)(Stanaszak, Steven)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana by Michael Slegers. (Stanaszak, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Michael Slegers filed by Hribar Transport LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Letter)(O'Neill, Matthew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stanaszak, Steven)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/1/2020. By 9/21/2020 plaintiff to file either amended complaint or response to defendant's motion to dismiss (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Michael Slegers in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, for Transfer of Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Confidentiality and Noncompete Agreement)(Stanaszak, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by Michael Slegers re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana . (Attachments: #1 Healthfuss v. CDH-Delnor)(Stanaszak, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively,, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana by Michael Slegers. (Stanaszak, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Hribar Transport LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (O'Neill, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hribar Transport LLC. (O'Neill, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/20/2020 re #3 Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on August 31, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Michael Slegers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stanaszak, Steven)
August 14, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Slegers of Removal Notices (Stanaszak, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Slegers from Racine County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20-CV-001144 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3540511) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Appearance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stanaszak, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hribar Transport LLC v. Slegers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Slegers
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Represented By: Pamela M Schmidt
Represented By: Andrew R Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hribar Transport LLC
Represented By: Robert J Ollman
Represented By: Matthew W O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?