Townsend v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Plaintiff: Teresa Townsend
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc and Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01256
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Geer on behalf of Teresa Townsend. Attorney(s) appearing: Martha A. Geer (Geer, Martha)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg Frederic Coleman on behalf of Teresa Townsend. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregory F. Coleman (Coleman, Greg)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/30/2020 re #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 77(c)(2) and Civil Local Rule 77(e). The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on October 14, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Responsive Pleading by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE STATING NO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT WILL BE FILED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc re #11 MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING A DECISION ON MDL CENTRALIZATION . (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATION OF SARAH L. BREW, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING A DECISION ON MDL CENTRALIZATION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah L Brew on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sarah L. Brew (Brew, Sarah)
September 24, 2020 Party Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Ortho LLC and Janssen Research & Development LLC terminated. (vkb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendants Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Ortho, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc. filed by Teresa Townsend. (Dickinson, Erin) Modified on 9/25/2020 (vkb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Teresa Townsend. (Dickinson, Erin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Townsend. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Townsend. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Townsend. Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Townsend. Janssen Ortho LLC served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Cohen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan B. Cohen (Cohen, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)
August 14, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Teresa Townsend. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3540740) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, #3 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #4 Summons Janssen Research & Development LLC, #5 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #6 Summons Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC, #7 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc, #8 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #9 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc)(Dickinson, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Townsend
Represented By: Erin K Dickinson
Represented By: Michelle Perkovic
Represented By: Krista K Baisch
Represented By: Jonathan Cohen
Represented By: Martha Geer
Represented By: Charles J Crueger
Represented By: Jonathan B Cohen
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Edward A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Sarah L Brew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?