Stauffer et al v. Mills Fleet Farm LLC et al
Plaintiff: Badger Mutual Insurance Company, Kathleen A. Stauffer and Kathleen A Stauffer
Defendant: Mills Fleet Farm LLC, Gree Electric Appliances of Zhuhai, MJC America LTD. d/b/a Soleus, John Does 1-10, ABC Insurance Companies, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD, Gree U.S.A., Inc., MJC America Ltd doing business as Soleus International Inc and Gree USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01258
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Kathleen A Stauffer re #13 MOTION to Remand CORRECTED AND IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE. (Schuster, Richard)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend Notice of Removal and RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 Corrected MOTION to Remand filed by defendants (Moran, Patrick) Modified on 9/25/2020 (vkb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD, Mills Fleet Farm LLC, MJC America Ltd, Gree USA Inc, Gree Electric Appliances of Zhuhai Amended Notice of removal from State of wisconsin Circuit court Forest county, Case Number: 2019cv000034 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee Refunded PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3583569) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moran, Patrick) Modified on 9/25/2020 (vkb) Modified on 9/25/2020 (vkb)
September 23, 2020 This case has been reassigned to newly appointed Judge Brett Ludwig. (kmm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 CORRECTED MOTION to Remand by Kathleen A Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Anderson v. Federated Mut. Ins. Co., No. 00-C-0312-C, 2000 WL 34228194 (W.D. Wis. Aug. 15, 2000) (unreported), #2 Comtrade Ltd. v. United States, No. 05-80729-CIV, 2005 WL 5643875 (S.D. Fla. Nov. 7, 2005) (unreported), #3 Durand v. The Hartford Life & Acc. Ins. Co., No. CIVA07CV00614MSKCBS, 2007 WL 1395336 (D. Colo. May 9, 2007) (unreported), #4 Employers-Shopmens Local 516 Pension Tr. v. Travelers Cas. & Sur. Co. of Am., No. 05-444-KI, 2005 WL 1653629 (D. Or. July 6, 2005) (unreported), #5 Kinateder v. Am. Family Mut. Ins. Co. of Wisconsin, No. CIVA08CV02263-REBKLM, 2009 WL 539668 (D. Colo. Mar. 4, 2009) (unreported))(Schuster, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Richard A. Schuster (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 7.17.2020 Hearing Transcript Excerpts)(Schuster, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Kathleen A Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Anderson v. Federated Mut. Ins. Co., No. 00-C-0312-C, 2000 WL 34228194 (W.D. Wis. Aug. 15, 2000) (unreported), #2 Comtrade Ltd. v. United States, No. 05-80729-CIV, 2005 WL 5643875 (S.D. Fla. Nov. 7, 2005) (unreported), #3 Durand v. The Hartford Life & Acc. Ins. Co., No. CIVA07CV00614MSKCBS, 2007 WL 1395336 (D. Colo. May 9, 2007) (unreported), #4 Employers-Shopmens Local 516 Pension Tr. v. Travelers Cas. & Sur. Co. of Am., No. 05-444-KI, 2005 WL 1653629 (D. Or. July 6, 2005) (unreported), #5 Kinateder v. Am. Family Mut. Ins. Co. of Wisconsin, No. CIVA08CV02263-REBKLM, 2009 WL 539668 (D. Colo. Mar. 4, 2009) (unreported))(Schuster, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gree USA Inc. (Moran, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD. (Moran, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by MJC America Ltd. (Moran, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gree Electric Appliances of Zhuhai. (Moran, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schuster, Richard)
August 26, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gree Electric Appliances of Zhuhai, Gree USA Inc, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD, MJC America Ltd, Mills Fleet Farm LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Moran, Patrick)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Gree Electric Appliances of Zhuhai, Gree USA Inc, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD, Mills Fleet Farm LLC.(Moran, Patrick) Modified on 8/26/2020 (kah).
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by All Defendants. (kah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Gree USA Inc, Mills Fleet Farm LLC. (kah)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD, MJC America LTD., Gree U.S.A., Inc., Gree Electric Appliances of Zhuhai from State of Wisconsin, Circuit Court of Forest County, Case Number: 2019CV000034 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3541735) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Mills Fleet and Gree Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Summons and Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Answer to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintffs Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit H - Stauffer Deposition Excerpt, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moran, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stauffer et al v. Mills Fleet Farm LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mills Fleet Farm LLC
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances of Zhuhai
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America LTD. d/b/a Soleus
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd doing business as Soleus International Inc
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Badger Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Stauffer
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A Stauffer
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?