Williams v. Mejia et al
Plaintiff: Jovan Williams
Defendant: CO Bishop, Jean Lutsey, John Doe, Scott Eckstein, John Kind and Alejandra Mejia
Case Number: 2:2020cv01266
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by CO Bishop, Scott Eckstein, John Kind, Jean Lutsey, Alejandra Mejia. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bachhuber, Rachel)
October 8, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to CO Bishop, Scott Eckstein, John Kind, Jean Lutsey, Alejandra Mejia (Bachhuber, Rachel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L Bachhuber on behalf of CO Bishop, Scott Eckstein, John Kind, Jean Lutsey, Alejandra Mejia. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel L. Bachhuber (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bachhuber, Rachel)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 9/18/2020 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee - SEE #7 Order. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 9-18-20. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, WCI)(Dries, Stephen) Modified on 9/21/2020 (kah).
September 14, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $.78, receipt number MK4689-083898. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jovan Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cmb)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before 9/8/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 0.78 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 8/18/2020. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, WCI)(kah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jovan Williams. (cmb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jovan Williams. (cmb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Jovan Williams. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Mejia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Bishop
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Lutsey
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Eckstein
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kind
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandra Mejia
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?