Currie v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shanice Currie
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01342
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. 1st Amended Affirmative Defenses (Pickover, Glen)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving #11 Stipulation Allowing Defendant to File First Amended Affirmative Defenses signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/27/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Allowing Defendant to File First Amended Affirmative Defenses by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Pickover, Glen)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/8/20. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on November 20, 2020 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Pickover, Glen)
October 1, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen H Pickover on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Glen Howard Pickover (Pickover, Glen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pickover, Glen)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 9/25/20. The parties' stipulation, ECF No. #5 , is APPROVED. The time for the defendants to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to 10/8/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
September 25, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to BOTH PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Pickover, Glen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanice Currie. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 9/4/2020. (Phillips, Christina)
September 1, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
September 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (kah)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Eshoo, Jr on behalf of Shanice Currie. Attorney(s) appearing: Edward Eshoo, Jr. (Eshoo, Edward)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Phillips on behalf of Shanice Currie. Attorney(s) appearing: Christina M. Phillips (Phillips, Christina)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company by Shanice Currie. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3556208) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Christina)
August 31, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currie v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Glen H Pickover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanice Currie
Represented By: Christina M Phillips
Represented By: Edward Eshoo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?