Riedel v. Saul
Plaintiff: Elizabeth F Riedel
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01361
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on September 21, 2020. (amb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on September 21, 2020. (amb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Tsui on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Judy Tsui (Tsui, Judy)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due December 28, 2020 Defendant's response due February 8, 2021; Plaintiff's reply due February 23, 2021. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/18/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/15/2020 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Elizabeth F Riedel. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fleming, Michael)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Elizabeth F Riedel. (Fleming, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Elizabeth F Riedel. (Fleming, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Elizabeth F Riedel (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleming, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riedel v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth F Riedel
Represented By: Michael W Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Judy Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?