Burke et al v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sean Burke and Tamina Burke
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, JPMorgan Chase Bank N A, Equifax Information Services LLC and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01531
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A.(Kaluza, Kristina)
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) by Sean Burke, Tamina Burke. (Gale, Elliot)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/13/20 granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions Inc answer due 12/14/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahoora, Marie)
November 10, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Bahoora, Marie)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie G Bahoora on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Marie G. Bahoora (Bahoora, Marie)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/6/20 granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank N A answer due 11/30/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A . (Kaluza, Kristina)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kaluza, Kristina)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaluza, Kristina)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Kaluza on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. Attorney(s) appearing: Kristina H. Kaluza and Michael A. Stephani (Kaluza, Kristina)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/30/20 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindstrom, Rebecca)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Lindstrom, Rebecca)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca M Lindstrom on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Rebecca M. Lindstrom (Lindstrom, Rebecca)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Transunion LLC.(Rang, Laura)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Transunion LLC. (Rang, Laura)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K Rang on behalf of Transunion LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura)
October 5, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jcl)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Sean Burke, Tamina Burke. (Gale, Elliot)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cmb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, JPMorgan Chase Bank N A, Transunion LLC by Sean Burke, Tamina Burke. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3592306) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gale, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke et al v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Marie G Bahoora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N A
Represented By: Michael A Stephani
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rebecca M Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Laura K Rang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Burke
Represented By: Elliot W Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamina Burke
Represented By: Elliot W Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?