Island Intellectual Property LLC v. American Deposit Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Island Intellectual Property LLC
Defendant: Robert Harm Zondag, Kelly Ann Brown, Bruce Allen Arbit, American Deposit Management LLC doing business as The American Deposit Management Co. and AB Data LTD
Case Number: 2:2020cv01535
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S Reynolds, II on behalf of AB Data LTD, Bruce Allen Arbit. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas S. Reynolds II (Reynolds, Thomas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/30/2020 re #10 Stipulation. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for acceptance of service and extension of deadlines and briefing schedule. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 21, 2020. If any defendant files a motion in response to the complaint, the plaintiff shall respond by the end of the day on February 1, 2021; the defendant shall reply by the end of the day on March 1, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Accept Service, Extend Deadlines and Briefing Schedule by Island Intellectual Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maher, Ann)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Island Intellectual Property LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Maher, Ann)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
October 5, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Island Intellectual Property LLC (Maher, Ann)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Island Intellectual Property LLC (Maher, Ann)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Island Intellectual Property LLC (Maher, Ann)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Island Intellectual Property LLC (Maher, Ann)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Island Intellectual Property LLC (Maher, Ann)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Maher, Ann)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Island Intellectual Property LLC. (Maher, Ann)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Island Intellectual Property LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3592715) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,509,286, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,668,772, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,019,667, #5 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,260,697, #6 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 8,566,201)(Maher, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island Intellectual Property LLC v. American Deposit Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Island Intellectual Property LLC
Represented By: Ann M Maher
Represented By: Stephen R Howe
Represented By: John Dellaportas
Represented By: Beth C Khinchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Harm Zondag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Ann Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Allen Arbit
Represented By: Thomas S Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Deposit Management LLC doing business as The American Deposit Management Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB Data LTD
Represented By: Thomas S Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?