Wells v. Koski et al
Plaintiff: Alfonzo Wells
Defendant: Sgt Hestheaven, Morris and Koski
Case Number: 2:2020cv01557
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
October 8, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05939. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Milwaukee the electronic record. (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/8/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER The Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin at Milwaukee forthwith, for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The case is terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/8/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/8/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/8/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Alfonzo Wells. (Envelope postmarked 9/28/2020) (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Koski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Hestheaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonzo Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?