West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01600
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Wolter, Leatha)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/1/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Reply Brief by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (DeRosier, Blake)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Austin B. Borton (Borton, Austin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by M Gregory Simpson on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Attorney(s) appearing: M. Gregory Simpson (Simpson, M)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake P DeRosier on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Attorney(s) appearing: Blake P. DeRosier (DeRosier, Blake)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Borton, Austin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Borton, Austin)
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #5 Declaration ; The Exhbits should have been filed as an attachment. #6 Proposed Order filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Proposed Orders should be e-filed as an attachment to the stipulation or motion and NOT e-filed as a separate document. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word or WordPerfect format. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED Proposed Order regarding Motion to Dismiss filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Wolter, Leatha)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Leatha G. Wolter with Exhibits A-C attached (Wolter, Leatha)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Wolter, Leatha)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Wolter, Leatha)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Wolter, Leatha)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America from Wisconsin Circuit Court, Washington County, Case Number: 2020CV000443 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3611156) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice to Remove, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolter, Leatha)
October 21, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Leatha G Wolter
Represented By: Blake P DeRosier
Represented By: M Gregory Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey L Leavell
Represented By: Austin B Borton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?