Maline v. Milwaukee County Jail
Plaintiff: Joseph Allan Maline
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Case Number: 2:2020cv01655
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/29/2020: The court ORDERS that the clerk's office shall reassign this case to United States District Judge Brett H. Ludwig. NOTE: There is no document associated with this text-only order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Pepper, Pamela)
December 29, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Brett Ludwig. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to the case. (cc: pltf) (vkb)
December 23, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $30.00, receipt number MK4689-84966. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/25/2020. On or before 12/24/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $30.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Joseph Maline at 4030 S. Austin St., West Allis, WI 53207
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph Allan Maline. (asc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joseph Allan Maline. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (blr)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Joseph Allan Maline. (blr)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Milwaukee County Jail by Joseph Allan Maline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(blr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2020: #2 Envelope) (blr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maline v. Milwaukee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Allan Maline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?