Green Beginnings, LLC v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Green Beginnings, LLC and Green Beginnings LLC
Defendant: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01661
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 22 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Green Beginnings LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Neiman, David)
December 31, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Green Beginnings LLC re #8 MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Consolidate . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Neiman, David)
December 28, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff's Counsel requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 7 days; the form is available #here. (bx)
December 23, 2020 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fathallah, Jason)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/21/20 granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 18, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Green Beginnings LLC. (Neiman, David)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #8 MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Consolidate regarding Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. (Fathallah, Jason)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #8 MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Consolidate . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List in Support of Brief in Opposition to Joint Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit 01 - Benson v Fischer, #3 Exhibit 02 - Evans v International Paper Co, #4 Exhibit 03 - Thompson v City of St Peters, #5 Exhibit 04 - Schissel v Wells, #6 Exhibit 05 - Van Patten v Wright, #7 Exhibit 06 - Evans v Mahoney, #8 Exhibit 07 - VOS Emergency Childcare Centers and Childcare Homes, #9 Exhibit 08 - In re Nuveen Fund Litigation, #10 Exhibit 09 - Elegant Massage LLC v State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #11 Exhibit 10 - KR Enterprises Inc v Ohio Security Insurance Company, #12 Exhibit 11 - Earwood v Essex Insurance Co, #13 Exhibit 12 - RLI Insurance Company v Fifth Third Bancorp, #14 Exhibit 13 - Owners Insurance Company v Dorsey, #15 Exhibit 14 - Liqui-Box Corp v Reid Valve Co Inc, #16 Exhibit 15 - Ledalite Architectural Products v Focal Point LLC, #17 Exhibit 16 - DAmico v Waste Management of New York LLC)(Fathallah, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #15 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Class Allegations, #2 Exhibit 01 - Bourbonnais v Ameriprise Financial Services Inc, #3 Exhibit 02 - Considerations for Events and Gatherings _ CDC, #4 Exhibit 03 - Coronavirus (COVID-19) frequently asked questions _ CDC, #5 Exhibit 04 - Social Distancing, #6 Exhibit 05 - Independent insurance agency locator tool for WI and the Midwest, #7 Exhibit 06 - MN EO 2020-20, #8 Exhibit 07 - MN EO 2020-42, #9 Exhibit 08 - WI EO 12, #10 Exhibit 09 - WI DCF Order 16, #11 Exhibit 10 - OH EO 2020-04D, #12 Exhibit 11 - WI EO 6, #13 Exhibit 12 - Transitional Pandemic Req Best Practices Centers, #14 Exhibit 13 - DCF Guidance, #15 Exhibit 14 - Illinois Guidance for Emergency Childcare Centers and Emergency Childcare Homes, #16 Exhibit 15 - Restore Illinois Introduction, #17 Exhibit 16 - Day v Humana Insurance Company, #18 Exhibit 17 - Executive Order 2020-69 - Illinois.gov, #19 Exhibit 18 - Executive Order 2020-70 - Illinois.gov, #20 Exhibit 19 - Executive Order 2020-73 - Illinois.gov, #21 Exhibit 20 - Kentucky's Response to COVID-19 - Kentucky Governor Andy Beshear, #22 Exhibit 21 - NC EO 169, #23 Exhibit 22 - MN Safe Opening, #24 Exhibit 23 - Coronavirus (COVID-19) Updates _ Iowa Alcoholic Beverages Division, #25 Exhibit 24 - Gov. Ricketts reinstates COVID-19 restrictions on bars, restaurants due to rising hospitalization rates, #26 Exhibit 25 - In re Pradaxa (Dabigatran Etexilate) Products Liability Litigation, #27 Exhibit 26 - Fullerton v Corelle Brands LLC, #28 Exhibit 27 - City of Chicago __ Industries Guidelines, #29 Exhibit 28 - In re Katrina Canal Breaches Litigation, #30 Exhibit 29 - Johnson v Geico Choice Insurance Company, #31 Exhibit 30 - Grundmeyer v Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, #32 Exhibit 31 - Blaise Williams individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, #33 Exhibit 32 - Revival Chiropractic LLC v Allstate Insurance Company)(Fathallah, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Fathallah, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 01 - Malaube LLC v Greenwich Insurance Company, #3 Exhibit 02 - Sandy Point Dental PC v Cincinnati Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit 03 - It's Nice v. State Farm - Transcript and Order, #5 Exhibit 04 - T&E Chicago LLC v The Cinncinati Order Granting MTD, #6 Exhibit 05 - Uncork and Create LLC v Cincinnati Insurance Company, #7 Exhibit 06 - West Coast Hotel Management LLC v Berkshire Hathaway Guard Ins Co, #8 Exhibit 07 - Marks Engine Company No 28 Restaurant LLC v Travelers Indemnity Company of, #9 Exhibit 08 - Plan Check Downtown III LLC v Amguard Insurance Company, #10 Exhibit 09 - 10E LLC v Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut, #11 Exhibit 10 - Mama Jos Inc v Sparta Insurance Company, #12 Exhibit 11 - Studio 417 Inc v Cincinnati Insurance Company, #13 Exhibit 12 - Blue Springs Dental Care LLC v Owners Insurance Company, #14 Exhibit 13 - Real Hospitality LLC v Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, #15 Exhibit 14 - Pappys Barber Shops Inc v Farmers Group Inc, #16 Exhibit 15 - Turek Enterprises Inc v State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #17 Exhibit 16 - Universal Image Productions Inc v Federal Ins Co, #18 Exhibit 17 - Columbiaknit Inc v Affiliated FM Ins Co, #19 Exhibit 18 - Henrys Louisiana Grill Inc v Allied Insurance Company of America, #20 Exhibit 19 - Mudpie Inc v Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, #21 Exhibit 20 - Ski Shawnee Inc v Commonwealth Ins Co, #22 Exhibit 21 - Water Sports Kauai Inc v Firemans Fund Insurance Company, #23 Exhibit 22 - United States v Forrest, #24 Exhibit 23 - United States v Snulligan, #25 Exhibit 24 - AFM Mattress Co LLC v Motorists Commercial Mutual Ins Co, #26 Exhibit 25 - Brian Handel DMD PC v Allstate Insurance Co, #27 Exhibit 26 - Urogynecology Specialist of Florida LLC v Sentinel Insurance Company LTD, #28 Exhibit 27 - Diesel Barbershop LLC v State Farm Lloyds, #29 Exhibit 28 - Franklin EWC Inc v Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, #30 Exhibit 29 - Prime Alliance Group Ltd v Hartford Fire Insurance Company, #31 Exhibit 30 - Border Chicken AZ LLC v Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, #32 Exhibit 31 - Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC v National Casualty Company, #33 Exhibit 32 - Kessler Dental Assoc. v. The Dentists Ins. Co.)(Fathallah, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Fathallah, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Helfand on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott Helfand (Helfand, Scott)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Elizabeth Foley on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Kayla E. Foley (Foley, Kayla)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L Tidwall on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Karen L. Tidwall (Tidwall, Karen)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by A J Fabianczyk on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: AJ Fabianczyk (Fabianczyk, A J)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/30/20 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company answer due 12/14/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Consolidate by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Neiman, David)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Fathallah, Jason)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Fathallah, Jason)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Fathallah on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Jason R. Fathallah (Fathallah, Jason)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Neiman on behalf of Green Beginnings LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: David A. Neiman (Neiman, David)
November 5, 2020 Summons Issued as to West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (jcl)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Green Beginnings LLC. (Romanucci, Antonio)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Green Beginnings LLC (Romanucci, Antonio)
November 3, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Green Beginnings, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3624120) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romanucci, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Beginnings, LLC v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: A J Fabianczyk
Represented By: Karen L Tidwall
Represented By: Jason R Fathallah
Represented By: Kayla Elizabeth Foley
Represented By: Scott Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Beginnings, LLC
Represented By: Antonio M Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Beginnings LLC
Represented By: Antonio M Romanucci
Represented By: David Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?