Ruehs v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ruehs
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01751
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/15/21. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on February 26, 2021 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P Stratz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregory P. Stratz (Stratz, Gregory)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Hanus, David)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/15/20 Granting #7 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to Answer. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel K. Ryan (Ryan, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Enlargement of Time by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanus, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hanus on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Hanus (Hanus, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Maynard, Timothy)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 11/25/2020. (Maynard, Timothy)
November 23, 2020 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (jcl)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maynard, Timothy)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America by Cheryl Ruehs. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3645611) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Life Insurance Company of North America)(Maynard, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruehs v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: David J Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ruehs
Represented By: Timothy P Maynard
Represented By: Gregory P Stratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?