Roessger et al v. State Collection Service Inc
Plaintiff: JANET RANFT, JOEL ROESSGER and DANIELLE STIMA
Defendant: STATE COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. and State Collection Service Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01757
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement in principle and request to close case administratively by Janet Ranft, Joel Roessger, Danielle Stima. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 29, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by State Collection Service Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fetherston, Kevin)
December 22, 2020 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Collection Service Inc.(Fetherston, Kevin)
November 24, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: Corrected punctuation of party names, removed addresses from party names, added attorneys - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
November 24, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M Fetherston on behalf of STATE COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.. Attorney(s) appearing: Kevin M. Fetherston (Fetherston, Kevin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by STATE COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.. (Johnson, Terry)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020CV005484 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3646286) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Circuit Court Record, #2 Envelope B: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (unfiled), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roessger et al v. State Collection Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET RANFT
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL ROESSGER
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE STIMA
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M Fetherston
Represented By: Terry E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Collection Service Inc
Represented By: Kevin M Fetherston
Represented By: Terry E Johnson
Represented By: Eugene X Martin, IV
Represented By: Robbie L Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?