Dotson v. Faulkner
Plaintiff: LaNita Dotson
Defendant: James Faulkner and Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2020cv01767
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Napierala on behalf of LaNita Dotson. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas R. Napierala (Napierala, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 NON-ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Under Memorandum of Understanding as to James Faulkner (Peacock, Ann)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that the Wisconsin Department of Corrections is DISMISSED. It is ORDERED that, under the informal service agreement, the defendant shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint within 60 days. (cc: all counsel)(asc)
December 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by LaNita Dotson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Strouse, Paul)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by LaNita Dotson. (Strouse, Paul)
November 30, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by LaNita Dotson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3651377) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3Civil Cover Sheet Summons)(Strouse, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). Modified on 12/1/2020 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Faulkner
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaNita Dotson
Represented By: Paul A Strouse
Represented By: Thomas R Napierala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?