Howard v. Hartman et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Howard
Defendant: CO Bode, Carla Hartman, Does and Nikki Kamphuis
Case Number: 2:2020cv01768
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Joshua Howard regarding initial partial filing fee payment. (lh)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/4/2021 re #6 plaintiff's letter motion for an extension of time to file his initial partial filing fee. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to pay his initial partial filing fee. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to pay his initial partial filing fee of $124 is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 19, 2021. By the end of the day on January 19, 2021 the plaintiff must either pay the initial partial filing fee or file a letter informing the court why he is not able to pay the fee. If the plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee or show cause for his failure to do so by the deadline, he will be held to have withdrawn his case voluntarily. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Joshua Howard at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 (Letter) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay initial partial filing fee by Joshua Howard. (lh)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/1/2020. On or before 12/31/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $124.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Joshua Howard at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Joshua Howard re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Howard. (lh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Joshua Howard. (lh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Joshua Howard. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Hartman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Bode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Hartman
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Kamphuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?