Brame et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Jason Jager, Gary Brame and Glen Evans
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01775
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by General Motors LLC re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unpublished Case Law)(Ross, April)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by General Motors LLC. (Ross, April)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by General Motors LLC. (Ross, April)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T Orton on behalf of General Motors LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Richard T. Orton (Orton, Richard)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Sooy on behalf of General Motors LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Kathleen T. Sooy (Sooy, Kathleen)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by April N Ross on behalf of General Motors LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: April N. Ross (Ross, April)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Raphael on behalf of General Motors LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel Raphael (Raphael, Rachel)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson D Miles, III on behalf of Gary Brame, Glen Evans, Jason Jager. Attorney(s) appearing: W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III (Miles, Wilson)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gary Brame, Glen Evans, Jason Jager. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stombaugh, Christopher)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gary Brame, Glen Evans, Jason Jager. (Stombaugh, Christopher)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by General Motors LLC - Waiver sent on 11/30/2020. (Stombaugh, Christopher)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against General Motors LLC by GARY BRAME, GLEN EVANS, JASON JAGER. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3652998) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stombaugh, Christopher)
December 1, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
December 1, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brame et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jager
Represented By: Christopher D Stombaugh
Represented By: Wilson D Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Brame
Represented By: Christopher D Stombaugh
Represented By: Wilson D Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Evans
Represented By: Christopher D Stombaugh
Represented By: Wilson D Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: April N Ross
Represented By: Richard T Orton
Represented By: Kathleen T Sooy
Represented By: Rachel Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?