Ratliff v. Litisha et al
Plaintiff: Bruce T Ratliff
Defendant: Litisha and Racine County Jail
Case Number: 2:2020cv01823
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bruce T Ratliff. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (bx)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/15/2020. ORDERING that Plaintiffs payment of his initial partial filing fee is WAIVED;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before January 15, 2021,Plaintiff may file a letter with the court stating that he does not wish toproceed with this action, in accordance with the directions provided above; see order (cc: all counsel and via mailed to pro se party and Warden)(bx)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (bx)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bruce T Ratliff. (bx)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bruce T Ratliff. (bx)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury filed against All Defendants by Bruce T Ratliff. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratliff v. Litisha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litisha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce T Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?