West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. United States
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 2:2020cv01854
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company served upon Office of Attorney General on 12/29/2020 (Roach, Kevin)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/6/21. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Roach, Kevin)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E Pawlak on behalf of United States. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Brian E. Pawlak (Pawlak, Brian)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3671015) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roach, Kevin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/16/2020) (jcl). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/16/2020) (jcl).
December 16, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
December 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to United States. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin T Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?