Hudson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Fantasia C. Hudson and Fantasia C Hudson
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01877
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties. Certified Administrative Record due 3/29/2021. (cc: all counsel) (tlf)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; U.S. Attorney General served on 1/21/2021. (lh)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/23/2020 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The clerk shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the Commissioner of Social Security. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (cav)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fantasia C Hudson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schultz, Barry)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Fantasia C. Hudson. (Schultz, Barry)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Fantasia C. Hudson. (Schultz, Barry)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Fantasia C. Hudson (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fantasia C. Hudson
Represented By: Barry A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fantasia C Hudson
Represented By: Barry A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?