Blakeman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Erica Lynn Blakeman
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01926
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/5/2021. By 3/12/2021, Defendant to serve on Plaintiff copy of proposed Notice of Mailing and Preservation of Rights and copy of the transcript of administrative proceedings. By 3/26/2021, parties to meet and confer in good faith effort to resolve matter. Plaintiff's brief due by 3/25/2021; Defendant's response due by 7/26/2021; Plaintiff's reply due by 8/9/2021. Briefs are subject to specified page limitations. No extensions of time for filing of briefs will be granted. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED Briefing Schedule filed by Andrew M Saul. (Yarnell, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Charles Yarnell on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Yarnell (Yarnell, Eric)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; by Erica Lynn Blakeman US Attorney served on January 5 2021. (Angermeier, Vincent)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE/DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Erica Lynn Blakeman (Angermeier, Vincent) Modified on 1/5/2021 (blr).
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Erica Lynn Blakeman. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Angermeier, Vincent)
January 4, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Erica Lynn Blakeman. (Angermeier, Vincent)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Erica Lynn Blakeman ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3685279) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit ALJ Denial Oct 27 2017, #3 Exhibit AC Denial July 6 2018, #4 Exhibit District Court Order April 1 2019, #5 Exhibit AC Remand April 29 2019, #6 Exhibit ALJ Denial Jan 28 2020, #7 Exhibit AC Denial Nov 13 2020)(Angermeier, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakeman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Lynn Blakeman
Represented By: Vincent R Angermeier
Represented By: Robert C Angermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Eric Charles Yarnell
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?